CT HB07102 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Concerning Authorization Of State Grant Commitments For School Building Projects And Concerning Changes To The Statutes Concerning School Building Projects.
Title
An Act Concerning Authorization Of State Grant Commitments For School Building Projects And Concerning Changes To The Statutes Concerning School Building Projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 372 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 480 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 480 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-20 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Public Act 15-3 |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor |
2015-06-29 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-29 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-29 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the House |
2015-06-29 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-29 | House | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9735 |
2015-06-29 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2015-06-27 | House | Emergency Certification |