CT HB07052 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Preventing Prescription Opioid Diversion And Abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 308 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Roll Call Vote 279 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Roll Call Vote 279 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Public Act 17-131 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-01 | Senate | File Number 821 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 564 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2017-05-31 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-31 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8124 |
2017-04-11 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-11 | House | No New File by Committee on Public Health |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health |
2017-03-23 | House | File Number 186 |
2017-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 155 |
2017-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |