CT HB07047 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require municipal and volunteer fire departments to maintain their pump and aerial fire apparatus components in compliance with national standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Municipal Fire Apparatus Safety And Testing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 407 PASS (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 154 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-11HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-06-26HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2017-06-26HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-06-20HousePublic Act 17-175
2017-06-07HouseIn Concurrence
2017-06-07HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-07HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2017-05-19HouseFile Number 778
2017-05-19HouseSenate Calendar Number 476
2017-05-19HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-05-17HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-05-17HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7038
2017-05-15HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2017-05-15HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2017-05-15HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-05-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-05-12HouseJoint Favorable
2017-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-20HouseFile Number 90
2017-03-20HouseHouse Calendar Number 93
2017-03-20HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-03-20HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-13HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/17 10:00 AM
2017-03-03HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-03HouseJoint Favorable
2017-02-17HousePublic Hearing 02/22
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback