CT HB07029 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To revise statutory provisions concerning Probate Court operations.
Title
An Act Concerning Probate Court Operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 454 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 116 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 116 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | House | Public Act 15-217 |
2015-06-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-06-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-03 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-18 | House | File Number 856 |
2015-05-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 545 |
2015-05-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-14 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7230 |
2015-04-23 | House | File Number 729 |
2015-04-23 | House | House Calendar Number 465 |
2015-04-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/15 5:00 PM |
2015-04-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-06 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-27 | House | Public Hearing 04/01 |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |