CT HB07023 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize short-term care group insurance policies, permit health care centers to charge coinsurance, amend the Insurers Rehabilitation and Liquidation Act and require that insurers issue notices to insureds regarding personal and commercial risk policies.
Title
An Act Concerning Step Therapy For Prescription Drugs Prescribed To Treat Stage Iv Metastatic Cancer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 445 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 446 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 314 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 446 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 314 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-23 | House | Public Act 17-228 |
2017-06-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B |
2017-06-04 | House | Senate Calendar Number 581 |
2017-06-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B |
2017-06-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8516 |
2017-06-03 | House | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 8514 |
2017-03-27 | House | File Number 225 |
2017-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 177 |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-16 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |