CT HB07022 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - File Number 819
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - File Number 819
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize state grant commitments for school building projects, to require the Department of Administrative Services to develop a standard checklist for construction projects of school buildings and establish a school building project clearinghouse, and to make revisions to the statutes relating to school building projects.
Title
An Act Concerning Authorization Of State Grant Commitments For School Building Projects And Changes To The Statutes Concerning School Building Projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | File Number 819 |
2015-05-14 | House | House Calendar Number 546 |
2015-05-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/13/15 5:00 PM |
2015-04-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-30 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |