CT HB07021 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - Bill Placed on Senate Agenda, Senate Agenda Never Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - Bill Placed on Senate Agenda, Senate Agenda Never Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To create a task force to study transportation issues facing veterans, senior citizens and persons with disabilities.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Best Practices To Provide Transportation For Veterans, Senior Citizens And Disabled Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 384 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | House | Bill Placed on Senate Agenda, Senate Agenda Never Adopted |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Calendar Number 621 |
2017-06-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-07 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-07 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2017-06-07 | House | House Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-03 | House | No New File by Committee on Transportation |
2017-03-31 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-31 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation |
2017-03-09 | House | File Number 29 |
2017-03-09 | House | House Calendar Number 57 |
2017-03-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/17 5:00 PM |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-02-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-09 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |