CT HB07010 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-16 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-16 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning The Authorization Of State Grant Commitments For School Building Projects, The Recognition Of Goodwin University As A Local Education Agency For Purposes Of Federal Law, Certain Exclusions To The Calculation Of A School District's Minimum Budget Requirement, And Delaying Certain Revisions To The Law Regarding The Provision Of Construction Management Services.
Title
An Act Concerning The Authorization Of State Grant Commitments For School Building Projects, The Recognition Of Goodwin University As A Local Education Agency For Purposes Of Federal Law, Certain Exclusions To The Calculation Of A School District's Minimum Budget Requirement, And Delaying Certain Revisions To The Law Regarding The Provision Of Construction Management Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 65 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 65 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 37 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION HOUSE AMD A (Y: 51 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 38 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 65 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 37 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION HOUSE AMD A (Y: 51 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 38 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-16 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Public Act 20-8 |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor |
2020-10-01 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2020-09-30 | House | House Passed |
2020-09-30 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 4472 |
2020-09-30 | House | Emergency Certification |