CT HB07010 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To enable better care and treatment of persons with opioid and other substance use disorders.
Title
An Act Concerning Opioids And Substance Use Disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-13 | House | File Number 587 |
2017-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 389 |
2017-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-03 | House | Public Hearing 02/10 |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |