CT HB07009 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-16 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-16 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning The Deadlines For Certain Property Tax Exemptions And Municipal Matters.
Title
An Act Concerning The Deadlines For Certain Property Tax Exemptions And Municipal Matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 64 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 64 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 36 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 64 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 36 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-16 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Public Act 20-7 |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor |
2020-10-01 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2020-09-30 | House | House Passed |
2020-09-30 | House | Emergency Certification |