CT HB07009 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that a federally required electronic visit verification system for home and community-based services funded under Medicaid is implemented with minimum burdens or penalties for providers of home and community-based services.
Title
An Act Revising Medicaid Audit Requirements And Establishing Temporary Waivers For Providers Implementing Electronic Visit Verification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-03 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2017-02-03 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |