CT HB07006 | 2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4)
Status: Passed on October 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-16 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Concerning Emergency Response By Electric Distribution Companies, The Regulation Of Other Public Utilities And Nexus Provisions For Certain Disaster-related Or Emergency-related Work Performed In The State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Emergency Response By Electric Distribution Companies, The Regulation Of Other Public Utilities And Nexus Provisions For Certain Disaster-related Or Emergency-related Work Performed In The State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 58 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 58 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 34 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-16SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2020-10-08SenatePublic Act 20-5
2020-10-02SenateSigned by Governor in Original
2020-10-01SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Governor
2020-10-01SenateIn Concurrence
2020-10-01SenateSenate Passed
2020-10-01SenateAmendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 4493
2020-09-30SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Senate
2020-09-30HouseHouse Passed
2020-09-30HouseEmergency Certification

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback