CT HB07006 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To modernize statutes authorizing the issuance of birth certificates for transgender people with an accurate gender designation.
Title
An Act Concerning Birth Certificate Amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 356 PASS (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 115 (Y: 122 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 115 (Y: 122 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-15 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-15 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-10 | House | Public Act 15-132 |
2015-06-01 | House | In Concurrence |
2015-06-01 | House | Senate Passed |
2015-05-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 553 |
2015-05-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | House Passed |
2015-04-16 | House | File Number 684 |
2015-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 449 |
2015-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-31 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-30 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |