CT HB07002 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-16 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-16 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning Certain Fees And Expenses Of State Marshals When Serving Process.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Fees And Expenses Of State Marshals When Serving Process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 62 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 62 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 25 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 62 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 25 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-16 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Public Act 20-1 |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor |
2020-10-01 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2020-09-30 | House | House Passed |
2020-09-30 | House | Emergency Certification |