CT HB07001 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - File Number 964
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - File Number 964
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require the Commissioner of Children and Families to make a reasonable effort to determine whether an individual against whom a recommended finding of responsibility for abuse or neglect of a child has been made is employed in a capacity that requires the individual to have regular contact with children and provide services to or on behalf of children, and (2) make a reasonable effort to notify the employer of an individual whose name has been placed on the child abuse and neglect registry if such individual has regular contact with children and provides services to or on behalf of children.
Title
An Act Concerning The Notification Of Certain Employers Of The Placement Of An Employee On The Child Abuse Or Neglect Registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 151 AS AMENDED (Y: 111 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | File Number 964 |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 579 |
2019-05-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7077 |
2019-03-25 | House | File Number 123 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Calendar Number 101 |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |