CT HB06998 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - File Number 120
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - File Number 120
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require contractors that contract with a local or regional board of education to notify the superintendent of schools for such board upon receipt of information that an employee of such contractor, who has direct contact with students, has been arrested.
Title
An Act Concerning Notification Of Abuse And Neglect Complaints And Investigations Pertaining To School Employees And Contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | File Number 120 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Calendar Number 98 |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |
2019-03-05 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |