CT HB06981 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a task force to study public health prevention efforts.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Public Health Prevention Efforts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 401 PASS (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 72 AS AMENDED (Y: 115 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 72 AS AMENDED (Y: 115 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-26 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-26 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-21 | House | Special Act 17-17 |
2017-06-07 | House | In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-04-21 | House | File Number 684 |
2017-04-21 | House | Senate Calendar Number 379 |
2017-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-04-19 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6149 |
2017-03-29 | House | File Number 286 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 216 |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2017-03-09 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2017-02-06 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |