CT HB06943 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - File Number 7
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - File Number 7
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow medical assistants to administer vaccines.
Title
An Act Allowing Medical Assistants To Administer Vaccines.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Sen. Will Haskell [D] | Rep. William Petit [R] | Rep. Ben Mcgorty [R] |
Rep. Nicole Klarides-Ditria [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | File Number 7 |
2019-02-27 | House | House Calendar Number 20 |
2019-02-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-02-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/26/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-13 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-01-31 | House | Public Hearing 02/04 |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |