CT HB06900 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To change the name of the committee to reference children and to change the committee chair appointments.
Title
An Act Concerning The Transforming Children's Behavioral Health Policy And Planning Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 374 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 163 AS AMENDED (Y: 125 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 163 AS AMENDED (Y: 125 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-15 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-15 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-12 | House | Public Act 23-90 |
2023-06-05 | House | In Concurrence |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-25 | Senate | File Number 830 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 554 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-23 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-23 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8034 |
2023-05-08 | House | File Number 743 |
2023-05-08 | House | House Calendar Number 501 |
2023-05-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/23 12:00 PM |
2023-04-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/28 |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |