CT HB06880 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To lower the minimum number of housing unit-equivalent points needed for a moratorium, expand the unit types that count towards a moratorium and redefine median income for purposes of the incentive housing zone statutes, and to sunset such changes after five years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Affordable Housing Land Use Appeals Procedure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 397 (Y: 101 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 462 REPASS (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 463 REPASS (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 371 PASS (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 273 AS AMENDED (Y: 116 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-24HouseIn Concurrence
2017-07-24HouseSenate Reconsidered, Veto Overruled
2017-07-24HouseImmediate Transmittal to the Senate
2017-07-24SenateVeto Overruled, House
2017-07-07SenateVetoed by the Governor
2017-06-23SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2017-06-23SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-06-19SenatePublic Act 17-170
2017-06-07SenateIn Concurrence
2017-06-07SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-07SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2017-05-31SenateFile Number 811
2017-05-31SenateSenate Calendar Number 559
2017-05-31SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-05-30SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Senate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-05-30HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7418
2017-05-18HouseBill Passed Temporarily
2017-05-18HouseHouse Designated House Amendment Schedule A 7418
2017-03-23HouseFile Number 179
2017-03-23HouseHouse Calendar Number 148
2017-03-23HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-03-23HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-17HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM
2017-03-08HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-07HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2017-02-10HousePublic Hearing 02/16
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Housing
2017-02-08HouseDrafted by Committee
2017-01-31HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Housing

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB06880&which_year=2017
Texthttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/TOB/h/2017HB-06880-R00-HB.htm
Texthttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/TOB/h/2017HB-06880-R01-HB.htm
Texthttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/TOB/h/2017HB-06880-R02-HB.htm
Texthttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/ACT/pa/2017PA-00170-R00HB-06880-PA.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/TS/h/2017HB-06880-R00HSG-CV12-TS.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/h/2017HV-00273-R00HB06880-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/s/2017SV-00371-R00HB06880-SV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/s/2017SV-00463-R00HB06880-SV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/s/2017SV-00462-R00HB06880-SV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/VOTE/h/2017HV-00397-R00HB06880-HV.htm

Bill Comments

feedback