CT HB06854 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - File Number 286
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - File Number 286
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Legislative Program Review and Investigations Committee concerning the reporting of certain data by managed care organizations and health insurance companies to the Insurance Department.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Legislative Program Review And Investigations Committee Concerning The Reporting Of Certain Data By Managed Care Companies And Health Insurance Companies To The Insurance Department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | File Number 286 |
2015-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 182 |
2015-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |