CT HB06830 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To modify the brownfield grant program to allow funds to be used for remediation and redevelopment plans for multiple brownfield sites and to allow the commissioner to award additional grant funds to a grant recipient, and to modify the brownfield loan program to allow loan funds to be used to acquire a brownfield, to change the maximum loan amount, and to exempt certain loan recipients from the requirement that they enter an additional brownfield remediation program.
Title
An Act Concerning The Remedial Action And Redevelopment Municipal Grant Program, The Targeted Brownfield Development Loan Program And The Remediation Of State-owned And Formerly State-owned Brownfields.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 448 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 79 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 79 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-16 | House | Public Act 15-193 |
2015-06-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-06-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-03 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-14 | House | File Number 826 |
2015-05-14 | House | Senate Calendar Number 501 |
2015-05-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-12 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-12 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6765 |
2015-04-13 | House | File Number 581 |
2015-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 371 |
2015-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Environment |
2015-03-13 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Environment |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Environment |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |