CT HB06752 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Authorize the Banking Commissioner to adopt, amend and rescind regulations, forms and orders governing the business use of digital assets; (2) define "virtual currency address", "virtual currency kiosk" and "virtual currency wallet"; and (3) establish certain requirements applicable to owners or operators of virtual currency kiosks.
Title
An Act Concerning Digital Assets.
Sponsors
House Banking Committee | Rep. Patricia Dillon [D] | Rep. Larry Butler [D] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] |
Rep. Joshua Hall [D] | Sen. Patricia Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 368 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 56 AS AMENDED (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 56 AS AMENDED (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-15 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-15 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-12 | House | Public Act 23-82 |
2023-06-05 | House | In Concurrence |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-08 | Senate | File Number 754 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 468 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-04 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-04 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7343 |
2023-03-22 | House | File Number 168 |
2023-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 134 |
2023-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |