CT HB06734 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) increase the minimum down payment required from a principal or indemnitor for a bail bond premium financing agreement with a surety bail bond agent, (2) make permissive the filing of a civil action for appropriate relief and permit a surety bail bond agent to apply to the Superior Court to be released from a bond when the balance of the promissory note has not been paid in full by the due date or a payment due is more than sixty days in arrears, (3) permit a judge to whom such application has been made to release the surety bail bond agent from such bond upon demonstration of diligent effort by such agent to collect such balance or payment due or for good cause shown, (4) impose an automatic cancellation of a surety bail bond agent's license if such agent has not paid the annual examination fee by January thirty-first, and (5) require the Insurance Commissioner to adopt regulations to establish continuing education requirements for surety bail bond agents.
Title
An Act Concerning Surety Bail Bond Agents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-05 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-23 | House | File Number 181 |
2015-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 117 |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |