CT HB06706 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Implementing Provisions Of The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2015 Concerning General Government.
Title
An Act Implementing Provisions Of The State Budget For The Biennium Ending June 30, 2015 Concerning General Government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 410 AS AMENDED (Y: 90 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 623 PASS EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 623 PASS EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Public Act 13-247 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules |
2013-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8941 |
2013-06-05 | House | Emergency Certification |