CT HB06691 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To allow credit card access to home equity lines of credit.
Title
An Act Concerning Credit Card Access To Home Equity Lines Of Credit.
Sponsors
House Banking Committee | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Rep. Travis Simms [D] | Rep. Corey Paris [D] |
Sen. Patricia Miller [D] | Rep. Hubert Delany [D] | Sen. Robert Sampson [R] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 367 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 235 AS AMENDED (Y: 123 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 235 AS AMENDED (Y: 123 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-15 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-15 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-12 | House | Public Act 23-78 |
2023-06-05 | House | In Concurrence |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-02 | Senate | File Number 853 |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 592 |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2023-06-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9063 |
2023-03-21 | House | File Number 137 |
2023-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 109 |
2023-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |