CT HB06681 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - File Number 163
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - File Number 163
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish procedures concerning the Office of the Attorney General and the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act.
Title
An Act Concerning The Office Of The Attorney General And The Dodd-frank Wall Street Reform And Consumer Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | File Number 163 |
2023-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 129 |
2023-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |