CT HB06667 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Public Hearing 02/27
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Public Hearing 02/27
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To permit the Auditors of Public Accounts to access any information concerning a state agency that is held by a state contractor and to require state contracts to contain a provision authorizing state agencies to access any of their data held by a contractor.
Title
An Act Concerning Access To State Agency Data Held By State Contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-02-20 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |