CT HB06663 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - File Number 480
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - File Number 480
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement federal court rulings regarding independent expenditure political committees and aggregate contribution limits for individuals.
Title
An Act Revising Certain Campaign Finance Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | File Number 480 |
2021-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 350 |
2021-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-30 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |