CT HB06647 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-01 - Senate Calendar Number 580
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-01 - Senate Calendar Number 580
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend certain requirements concerning the state plan of conservation and development.
Title
An Act Concerning The State Plan Of Conservation And Development.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Hubert Delany [D] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 195 AS AMENDED (Y: 95 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 580 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-31 | Senate | File Number 843 |
2023-05-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8921 |
2023-03-20 | House | File Number 111 |
2023-03-20 | House | House Calendar Number 88 |
2023-03-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-10 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |