CT HB06641 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-13-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-13-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide that sexual intercourse or sexual contact with a person, whose ability to resist or communicate consent is substantially impaired because of such person's mental or physical condition, constitutes the offense of sexual assault.
Title
An Act Concerning The Sexual Assault Of A Person Who Is Physically Helpless Or Whose Ability To Consent Is Otherwise Impaired.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 329 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 109 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 109 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-20 | House | Public Act 13-47 |
2013-05-16 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-09 | House | File Number 787 |
2013-05-09 | House | Senate Calendar Number 561 |
2013-05-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6580 |
2013-05-01 | House | File Number 670 |
2013-05-01 | House | House Calendar Number 463 |
2013-05-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-21 | House | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |