CT HB06625 | 2013 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To require testing services providing a general educational development testing program to make data relating to such testing program available to the Department of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The General Educational Development Testing Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 145 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-04HouseSenate Recommitted to Education
2013-06-03HouseMoved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
2013-05-13HouseSenate Calendar Number 581
2013-05-13HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2013-05-09HouseHouse Passed
2013-04-11HouseFile Number 470
2013-04-11HouseHouse Calendar Number 306
2013-04-11HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2013-04-11HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-04-05HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
2013-03-25HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-03-22HouseJoint Favorable
2013-03-11HousePublic Hearing 03/15
2013-03-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback