CT HB06607 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require state-owned and leased buildings to turn off nonessential outdoor lighting during peak avian migration periods in order to assist in preventing birds from flying into the sides of such buildings.
Title
An Act Concerning The Nighttime Lighting Of State-owned Buildings At Certain Times For The Protection Of Birds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 446 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 64 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 64 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-15 | House | Public Act 23-143 |
2023-06-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-08 | Senate | File Number 751 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 458 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-04 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-04 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7361 |
2023-03-22 | House | File Number 159 |
2023-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 125 |
2023-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-03 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-09 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |