CT HB06603 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - File Number 243
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - File Number 243
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to study methods that the Department of Economic and Community Development may use to encourage innovation and entrepreneurship in the state.
Title
An Act Requiring A Study Concerning Innovation And Entrepreneurship In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | File Number 243 |
2019-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 161 |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2019-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |