CT HB06600 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the owner of real property to disclose the existence of smoke and carbon monoxide detectors at the beginning of a residential disclosure report.
Title
An Act Concerning Smoke Detection And Warning Equipment, The State Fire Prevention And Fire Safety Codes, The Code Training And Education Board Of Control, Temporary Fire Marshals, Certain Fire Reports And Small Water Heaters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 445 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 180 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 180 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-24 | House | Public Act 21-165 |
2021-06-09 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-26 | House | File Number 729 |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate Calendar Number 502 |
2021-05-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-24 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9167 |
2021-04-12 | House | File Number 392 |
2021-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 305 |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-05 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |