CT HB06595 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide an exemption from the sales tax for baby diapers.
Title
An Act Exempting Baby Diapers From The Sales Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-03-23 | House | File Number 168 |
2015-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 111 |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |
2015-03-03 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |