CT HB06590 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Senate Calendar Number 482
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Senate Calendar Number 482
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow local traffic authorities to establish lower speed limits on streets under their jurisdiction by holding a public hearing regarding such speed limits and providing notification of such speed limits to the Office of the State Traffic Administration.
Title
An Act Concerning Speed Limits In Municipalities.
Sponsors
House Transportation Committee | Rep. Julio Concepcion [D] | Rep. Roland Lemar [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] |
Rep. Anthony D'Amelio [R] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Sen. Marilyn Moore [D] | Rep. Carol Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 84 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Senate Calendar Number 482 |
2019-05-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-08 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 404 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 256 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-20 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |