CT HB06586 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) adjust distribution of supplemental nutrition assistance benefits so that beneficiaries receive monthly benefits at multiple intervals during the month, and (2) ensure persons who received recent increases in Social Security payments don't lose such benefits.
Title
An Act Concerning Supplemental Nutrition Assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-02 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-30 | House | File Number 322 |
2023-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 221 |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-10 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |