CT HB06571 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To: (1) Remove the word "intentionally" regarding sexual assault in the fourth degree for consistency with the remainder of the section; and (2) resolve a conflict in the mandatory minimum sentences prescribed for kidnapping in the first degree and kidnapping in the first degree with a firearm.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Connecticut Sentencing Commission With Respect To Sexual Assault In The Fourth Degree And Kidnapping In The First Degree With A Firearm.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 259 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 84 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 84 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-17 | House | Public Act 13-28 |
2013-05-14 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-14 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | Senate Calendar Number 508 |
2013-05-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-01 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-24 | House | File Number 633 |
2013-04-24 | House | House Calendar Number 421 |
2013-04-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |