CT HB06569 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-11-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-11-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require that a person be not less than eighteen years of age to be eligible to marry.
Title
An Act Concerning The Minimum Age To Be Eligible To Marry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 323 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 50 (Y: 98 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 50 (Y: 98 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-07 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-07 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-06 | House | Public Act 23-44 |
2023-06-02 | House | In Concurrence |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 438 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-03 | House | House Passed |
2023-04-13 | House | File Number 577 |
2023-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 348 |
2023-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |