CT HB06558 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-22 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-22 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide for the quick clearance of state highways and to amend provisions concerning the schedule of rates and charges for certain towing and transporting of motor vehicles.
Title
An Act Concerning The Quick Clearance Of State Highways, Towing And Transporting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-04 | House | File Number 373 |
2013-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 253 |
2013-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |