CT HB06554 | 2011 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To prevent deaths due to drug overdoses by encouraging persons to make emergency calls summoning medical assistance without fear that seeking such assistance will lead to a prosecution for the illegal possession of drugs or drug paraphernalia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Emergency Medical Assistance For Persons Experiencing An Overdose And The Designation Of Certain Synthetic Stimulants As Controlled Substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 568 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 270 AS AMENDED (Y: 128 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-13 Signed by the Governor
2011-06-30 Transmitted to the Secretary of State
2011-06-28 Public Act 11-210
2011-06-08 On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2011-06-08 Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
2011-06-08 Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
2011-06-04 File Number 902
2011-06-04 Senate Calendar Number 639
2011-06-04 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2011-06-03 Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
2011-06-03 House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
2011-06-03 House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7973
2011-06-03 House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8046
2011-04-28 File Number 655
2011-04-28 House Calendar Number 384
2011-04-28 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2011-04-28 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2011-04-21 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/11 5:00 PM
2011-04-15 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2011-04-14 Joint Favorable
2011-03-10 Public Hearing 03/14
2011-03-07 Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback