CT HB06552 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow residents of long-term care facilities to use technology of their choice.
Title
An Act Concerning The Rights Of Residents In Nursing Home Facilities To Use The Technology Of Their Choice For Virtual Connections To Family, Friends And Other Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 48 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 49 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 49 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | File Number 627 |
2021-04-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 373 |
2021-04-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-04-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7497 |
2021-03-29 | House | File Number 173 |
2021-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 161 |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |