CT HB06552 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
Pending: Joint Planning and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To exempt from certain historic preservation requirements certain construction plans or projects to alter historic structures located in opportunity zones within distressed municipalities with populations of less than thirty thousand.
Title
An Act Concerning Exemptions From Certain Historic Preservation Requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-03-26 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-15 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2019-02-06 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |