CT HB06548 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To implement the recommendations of the Jury Selection Task Force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Jury Selection Task Force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 410 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 129 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-12HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2021-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2021-06-25HousePublic Act 21-170
2021-06-08HouseIn Concurrence
2021-06-08HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2021-06-08HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2021-05-20HouseFile Number 706
2021-05-20HouseSenate Calendar Number 444
2021-05-20HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2021-05-18HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2021-05-18HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8781
2021-05-11HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2021-05-11HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2021-05-11HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-05-11HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-05-10HouseJoint Favorable
2021-05-04HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2021-04-22HouseFile Number 577
2021-04-22HouseHouse Calendar Number 404
2021-04-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2021-04-22HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-16HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM
2021-04-07HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-06HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2021-03-11HousePublic Hearing 03/15
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB06548&which_year=2021
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/H/PDF/2021HB-06548-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/H/PDF/2021HB-06548-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TOB/H/PDF/2021HB-06548-R02-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/ACT/PA/PDF/2021PA-00170-R00HB-06548-PA.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO08781-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO08760-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO08675-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/lcoamd/pdf/2021LCO08651-R00-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021HB-06548-R000577-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021HB-06548-R000577-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06548-R00LCO08651-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06548-R00LCO08675-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06548-R00LCO08760-FNA.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/fna/pdf/2021HB-06548-R00LCO08781-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021HB-06548-R01-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021HB-06548-R01-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/FN/PDF/2021HB-06548-R010706-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/BA/PDF/2021HB-06548-R010706-BA.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TS/H/PDF/2021HB-06548-R00JUD-CV104-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/TS/H/PDF/2021HB-06548-R00APP-CV104-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/H/PDF/2021HV-00129-R00HB06548-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2021/VOTE/S/PDF/2021SV-00410-R00HB06548-SV.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback