CT HB06527 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-12 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-12 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To encourage the use of tax incremental financing in enterprise corridor zones.
Title
An Act Concerning Tax Incremental Financing In Enterprise Corridor Zones, Tax Incremental Financing In Municipal Development Zones, And Allowing Certain Commercial Properties In Bristol And Plainville To Qualify For Enterprise Zone Benefits.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Berger [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Boukus [D] | House Commerce Committee | Sen. Mae Flexer [D] |
Rep. Linda Gentile [D] | Rep. Frank Nicastro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-04-06 | File Number 410 | |
2011-04-06 | House Calendar Number 257 | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-06 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-22 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-04 | Public Hearing 03/10 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |