CT HB06518 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - File Number 764
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - File Number 764
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To determine the best way to provide services to recipients of Medicaid through an administrative services organization.
Title
An Act Establishing An Administrative Services Organization For The Medicaid Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | File Number 764 | |
2011-05-05 | House Calendar Number 456 | |
2011-05-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-25 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-17 | Public Hearing 03/31 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |