CT HB06489 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the ability of law enforcement agencies to identify perpetrators of crimes by requiring persons arrested for serious felony offenses to submit to the taking of a DNA sample.
Title
An Act Requiring Dna Testing Of Persons Arrested For The Commission Of A Serious Felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 535 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 267 AS AMENDED (Y: 123 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 267 AS AMENDED (Y: 123 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-207 | |
2011-06-08 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-03 | File Number 898 | |
2011-06-03 | Senate Calendar Number 633 | |
2011-06-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-06-02 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2011-06-02 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-02 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7900 | |
2011-05-24 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-24 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-05-24 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-17 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-20 | File Number 594 | |
2011-04-20 | House Calendar Number 355 | |
2011-04-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-07 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-06 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-04 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |