CT HB06487 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - File Number 26
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - File Number 26
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To study the regulations of the Departments of Agriculture and Energy and Environmental Protection.
Title
An Act Concerning The Regulations Of The Departments Of Agriculture And Energy And Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | File Number 26 |
2023-03-07 | House | House Calendar Number 42 |
2023-03-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/23 5:00 PM |
2023-02-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-02-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing 01/30 |
2023-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |