CT HB06485 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure the continuation of job training program contracts with the community-technical colleges and to better align postsecondary education with employment.
Title
An Act Concerning The Alignment Of Postsecondary Education And Employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 479 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 229 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 229 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-24 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-21 | Public Act 11-133 | |
2011-06-07 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-02 | File Number 885 | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Calendar Number 615 | |
2011-06-02 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-06-01 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2011-06-01 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-01 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7382 | |
2011-05-10 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-10 | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-05-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-05 | Referred by House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-05-02 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-02 | No New File by Committee on Education | |
2011-05-02 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-02 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-29 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-26 | Referred by House to Committee on Education | |
2011-04-19 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-19 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-04-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-18 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-12 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-04-04 | File Number 358 | |
2011-04-04 | House Calendar Number 213 | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-17 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-04 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |
2011-02-25 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |